+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/17/12
- 2:06 PM 5/11/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/16 CHAPTER 21 SLA 12
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 146(RES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 146(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN
- FIN RPT 4DP
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
- L&C RPT 5DP
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011
- RLS RPT CS(RES) 1DP 6NR
- DP: AUSTERMAN
- NR: TUCK, GRUENBERG, OLSON, CHENAULT, GATTO, JOHNSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 146(RES)
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 146(RES)
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP 1AM
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, GARA, JOULE, HAWKER, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN,
- AM: T.WILSON
- STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: GARDNER, FOSTER, MUNOZ, P.WILSON, HERRON, DICK, FEIGE, SEATON
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor