+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 29 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/22
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(HSS)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, COSTELLO
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 145(HSS)
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3NR 1DP
- NR: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK
- DP: GRAY-JACKSON
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP 2NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK,
- FOSTER
- NR: JOHNSON, WOOL
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2022
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y33 N5 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 145(HSS)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(HSS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: MCCARTY
On April 15, 2022 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 4/15 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: (CED)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N18 E8 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 1NR
- DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
- NR: KURKA
- FN1: (CED)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- L&C RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: KAUFMAN
- FN1: (CED)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, STORY
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, HSS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y31 N18 E8 A1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor