+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/03
- 2:00 PM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 86 SLA 03
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 145(FIN)(EFD FLD S)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N8
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N8
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N8
- PASSED Y12 N8
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(FIN)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- JUD RPT 2DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT;
- DNP: ELLIS, FRENCH; NR: OGAN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N11 A2
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 145(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N10 E2
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y25 N13 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/18
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/17
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N10 E3
- PASSED Y23 N14 E3
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- AMEND TO ADOPT JUDICIARY CS
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- MOVED TO ADOPT FINANCE CS
- FAILED TO ADOPT JUD CS Y9 N28 E3
- FAILED RETURN TO JUDICIARY Y9 N27 E3 A1
- FIN CS ADOPTED Y25 N12 E3
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N27 E3
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y8 N25 E5 A2
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y10 N24 E5 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- DP: FOSTER, WILLIAMS; DNP: KERTTULA,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 3DNP 6NR
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- BERKOWITZ, MOSES; NR: MEYER, HAWKER,
- STOLTZE, CHENAULT, WHITAKER, HARRIS
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- GRUENBERG; NR: HOLM, SAMUELS, OGG
- DP: ANDERSON, MCGUIRE; DNP: GARA,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 2DNP 3NR
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor