+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N17 E1 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 22, 1997 in the House:
- KUBINA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y21 N17 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 143
On April 21, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/97
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FAILED Y29 N10 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/22 CALENDAR
On April 1, 1997 in the House:
- STA RPT 2DP 3DNP 2NR
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DOE, DOT)
- BERKOWITZ, IVAN; NR: JAMES, DYSON
- DP: HODGINS, VEZEY; DNP: ELTON,
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HODGINS
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor