+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/1/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 47 SLA 99
On May 22, 1999 in the House:
- 10:20 AM 5/22/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 143(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/99
On May 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- NR: HOFFMAN, DONLEY
- DP: MACKIE, LEMAN, TIM KELLY;
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On May 10, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 143(L&C)
- PASSED Y34 A6
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- L&C
On May 8, 1999 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/99
On May 3, 1999 in the House:
- FINANCE REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- JUDICIARY REFERRAL WAIVED
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- HARRIS, CISSNA
- DP: ROKEBERG, HALCRO; NR: MURKOWSKI,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 3NR
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor