+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/21/97
- 11:50 AM 6/9/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 97 SLA 97
On May 10, 1997 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 A3
On May 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 141(RES)
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/97
- THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y14 N5 E1
On May 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS (F&G)
- NR: HALFORD, GREEN, LINCOLN
- DP: TORGERSON, LEMAN
- RES RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On April 11, 1997 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 141(RES) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/97
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 1, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 3DP 4NR
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 2/27/97
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, HUDSON
- NR: MASEK, OGAN, NICHOLIA, JOULE
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
- OGAN
- DP: AUSTERMAN, KUBINA, HODGINS, IVAN,
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 5DP
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- FSH, RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor