+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
- 10:55 AM 6/5/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 37 SLA 09
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, OLSON, ELLIS
- FN1: (DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 141
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, MEYER, HUGGINS
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 141
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 141
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: HB 141
On April 11, 2009 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: AUSTERMAN
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, CRAWFORD, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, HAWKER, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT 8DP 1NR
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP
- FN1: (DHS)
- DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: HOLMES, LYNN, HERRON
- DP: COGHILL, SEATON, CISSNA, KELLER
- HSS RPT 4DP 3NR
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- HSS, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS