+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (71)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
- 10:30 AM 7/14/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- FN9: (S.FIN/CED)
- FN7: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN4: (DNR)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 87 SLA 14
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2014
- FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 2DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY
- NR: MEYER, BISHOP
- AM: OLSON, HOFFMAN
- FN4: (DNR)
- FN7: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN8: ZERO(S.FIN/GOV)
- FN9: (S.FIN/CED)
- PASSED Y16 N4
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 140(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 140(JUD)
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: MCGUIRE, DYSON
- NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
- FN5: (DEC)
- FN6: (CED)
- FN4: (DNR)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 140(FIN) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KAWASAKI
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: P.WILSON
- PASSED Y37 E3
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 140(FIN)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, TARR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- AUSTERMAN
- DP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, MUNOZ, GARA, HOLMES, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, T.WILSON, OLSON
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- DP: PRUITT, FOSTER, LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- NR: GRUENBERG
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, LEDOUX, HIGGINS
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor