+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 11:08 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 116 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/04
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 14(STA)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 14(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G;
- NR: DYSON, GUESS, COWDERY
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N23 E3 A2
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- NEW AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 14 AM
- PASSED Y32 N2 E4 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 14 AM
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, MOSES, WHITAKER,
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 3AM
- DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, WEYHRAUCH;
- AM: GRUENBERG, SEATON, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN