+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/16 CHAPTER 8 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- 10:55 AM 4/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 139(RES)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 139(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, STEVENS B,
- FRENCH, COWDERY
- PASSED Y16 N1 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, DYSON,
- WAGONER; NR: LINCOLN, ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MASEK, WOLF, KERTTULA,
- GUTTENBERG, FATE, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 139(RES)
- PASSED Y29 E7 A3 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GARA, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 139(RES)
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES