+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
- -FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 2/24/94
- AM: VEZEY, TOOHEY
- NR: G.DAVIS, OLBERG, BUNDE
- DP: KOTT, NICHOLIA, BRICE
- HES RPT CS(HES) 3DP 3NR 2AM
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PORTER,FOSTER,HANLEY,KOTT
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACLEAN
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 3/26/93
- DP: GREEN, WILLIAMS,MULDER,SITTON,HUDSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP
On February 8, 1993 in the House:
- L&C, HES, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor