+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 139
- PASSED Y31 N2 E2 A5
- RESCIND ACTION PASSAGE UC, MOTION WITHDRAWN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 139
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 6NR
- DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N26 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, LEBON, KOPP, STORY
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
On May 11, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: STORY, SHAW, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
- NR: HOPKINS, VANCE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N26 A2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor