+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER, VON IMHOF, GARDNER, WILSON, MEYER
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- HSS RPT 4DP
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- RETURNED TO SENATE
- PRIME SPONSOR: SPONHOLZ
- BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSS, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 138
- PASSED Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, PRUITT
- VERSION: HB 138
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- DP: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, FANSLER
- CRA RPT 5DP
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- NR: EASTMAN
- DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
- HSS RPT 6DP 1NR
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- HSS, CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor