+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, ORTIZ, MERRICK, TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, RASMUSSEN
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor