+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 1:43 PM 8/5/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/8 CHAPTER 152 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E3 A2
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 135(HES)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 135(HES)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS(HES) 5DP
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH,
- STEVENS G, SEEKINS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- NR: DYSON, WILKEN, GREEN, GUESS;
- DP: DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, L&C
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 135(HES)
- PASSED Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 135(HES)
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 7DP
- DP: GATTO, WOLF, HEINZE, SEATON,
- CISSNA, KAPSNER, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 7, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT 5DP 1AM
- DP: GATTO, CRAWFORD, DAHLSTROM,
- ROKEBERG, ANDERSON; AM: LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, HES