+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- NR: MICCICHE, KELLY
- DP: STEDMAN
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH HSS REPORT
- HSS RPT 1DP 2NR
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 134(HSS)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, ISAACSON
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 134(HSS)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, TARR
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- NR: THOMPSON, NEUMAN, T.WILSON, AUSTERMAN
- DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT CS(HSS) NT 6DP 4NR
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- NR: PRUITT, KELLER
- DP: REINBOLD, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 4DP 2NR
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor