+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, SHOWER
- HSS RPT 3DP
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON
- HSS, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 133
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, RASMUSSEN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 E5
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 133
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/28 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N23 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOSEPHSON, TUCK
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- NR: SHAW, EASTMAN
- DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- DP: TARR, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ
- HSS RPT 4DP
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- HSS, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor