+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- 11:15 A.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/29 CHAPTER 47 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/28/22
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 133(L&C)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 133(L&C)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CAL
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK
- FN3: ZERO(UA)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 3NR 2DP
- NR: WILSON, REINBOLD, COSTELLO
- DP: BEGICH, HUGHES
- FN3: ZERO(UA)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, L&C
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 133(L&C)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 133(L&C)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 1NR
- DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
- NR: KURKA
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(UA)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- HSS REPLACES FIN REFERRAL
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 1NR
- DP: SNYDER, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS
- NR: KAUFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(UA)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor