+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- 10:10 AM 6/9/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/11/99
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y25 N15
On May 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N6 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 5/18/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 AM S
- PASSED Y15 N5
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7NR 1DNP 1AM
- NR: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, GREEN, DONLEY,
- WILKEN, LEMAN, PETE KELLY;
- AM: PARNELL; DNP: ADAMS
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOT)
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DNR, F&G)
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 1DP 2NR
- DP: WARD; NR: HALFORD, MILLER
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOT)
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DNR, F&G)
On April 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRA, FIN
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 28, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131
- PASSED Y25 N12 A3
- CROFT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1DNP 5NR
- DP: BUNDE, KOHRING, GRUSSENDORF,
- FOSTER; DNP: MOSES; NR: THERRIAULT,
- MULDER, WILLIAMS, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOT) 4/1/99
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DNR) 4/1/99
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- FINANCE REFERRAL ADDED
On April 1, 1999 in the House:
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, MORGAN, BARNES,
- OGAN; NR: JOULE, KAPSNER
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOT)
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (F&G, DNR)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RES