+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/25/13
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:25 AM 6/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 65 SLA 13
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 131
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, GIESSEL
- CRA RPT 3DP
- FN3: ZERO(DOT)
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2013
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, GARA
- VERSION: HB 131
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(DOT)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: LYNN, FEIGE, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, P.WILSON
- TRA RPT 6DP
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, OLSON
- FN3: ZERO(DOT)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: REINBOLD, OLSON, NAGEAK, LEDOUX
- CRA RPT 4DP
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- CRA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor