+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (97)
On September 15, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/23/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/25 CHAPTER 8 FSSLA 05
- 2:03 PM 7/15/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 2005 in the House:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y22 N13 A5 CCS HB 130
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N4 A5
On May 13, 2005 in the House:
- FN2: (LAW)
- CC REPORT: CCS HB 130
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: (DNR)
- FN4: (UA)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH CC REPORT
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y11 N6 E3 CCS HB 130
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N5 E3
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- RAMRAS (CHAIR), WEYHRAUCH, SALMON
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N18 E2
- SPECIAL SESSION BILL - SEE S. JOURNAL P. 1606
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N30 A10
- SPECIAL SESSION BILL - SEE H. JOURNAL P. 1962
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- WAGONER (CHAIR), WILKEN, ELLIS
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 130(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N3 E1
- PASSED Y12 N7 E1
- ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT Y10 N9 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 130(FIN)
On May 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON, DYSON
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 1DNP 3NR SAME TITLE
- HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN
- DNP: STEDMAN
- FN4: (UA)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: (LAW)
- FN3: (DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2005
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N10 E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 E3
- VERSION: CSHB 130(FIN) AM
- ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT Y31 N7 E2
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 6 REOFFERED
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y14 N20 E3 A3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 130(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y32 N5 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 E3 A1
- ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT UC
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N22 E1 A3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2005
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E1 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- NEW AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N22 E1 A2
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- HELD IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- NR: HOLM, STOLTZE, MOSES, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 5NR
- DP: HAWKER, WEYHRAUCH, KELLY, FOSTER;
- FN2: (LAW)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: (DNR)
- FN4: (UA)
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- NR: GATTO, ELKINS, SAMUELS
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 3NR
- DP: LEDOUX, CRAWFORD, SEATON, RAMRAS;
- FN4: (UA)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: (LAW)
- FN3: (DNR)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN4: (UA)
- FN3: (DNR)
- FN2: (LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor