+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (95)
On May 31, 2006 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 41 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 18, 2006 in the House:
- 12:15 PM 5/15/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On May 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 13(FIN)
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N33 A7
- GATTO (CHAIR), NEUMAN, JOULE
- RESCIND ACTION Y27 N11 E1 A1
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y26 N12 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On May 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ENGROSSED
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 13(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N12
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N13
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- STEVENS G NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 2AM SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- AM: OLSON, DYSON
- FN6: (EED)
- FN7: (EED)
- FN8: (EED)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(EED)
- FN10: (EED)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DAVIS, FRENCH, ELLIS, ELTON, KOOKESH, WAGONER,
- WILKEN, GREEN, STEDMAN, BUNDE, COWDERY, GUESS, STEVENS G, STEVENS B
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 13(RLS) AM
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 3DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: KOHRING, MCGUIRE, ROKEBERG;
- NR: HARRIS, COGHILL;
- AM: BERKOWITZ, GUTTENBERG
- FN3: (EED)
- FN4: (EED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(EED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y37 N3
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM NO 3 AS AM FAILED Y16 N22 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 13(RLS) AM
- PASSED Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- NEUMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, ROKEBERG, SEATON
On May 2, 2005 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 4NR
- DP: JOULE, WEYHRAUCH, CROFT, MOSES, FOSTER, CHENAULT;
- NR: HAWKER, HOLM, KELLY, MEYER
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
- FN2: (EED)
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP 1NR
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, KOHRING, WILSON;
- NR: SEATON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
On March 4, 2005 in the House:
- EDU RPT 5DP
- DP: GARA, GATTO, WILSON, THOMAS, NEUMAN
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/04
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDU, HES, FIN
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor