+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/23/08
- 2:48 PM 5/2/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 35 SLA 08
On April 4, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E3 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 13(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 13(FIN)
On March 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 20
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On April 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 13(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, LEDOUX
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 13(FIN)
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROSES, DAHLSTROM, JOHNSON, JOHANSEN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2007
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: GARA, CHENAULT
- DP: CRAWFORD, THOMAS, KELLY, HAWKER, MEYER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 2NR
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: DOLL, COGHILL
- DP: JOHNSON, GRUENBERG, LYNN
- STA RPT CS(W&M) NT 3DP 2NR
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- AM: WILSON, SEATON, CISSNA
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, ROSES, HAWKER
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) NT 3DP 3AM
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- W&M, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/5/07
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor