+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- NR: GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, GATTO
- DNP: LYNN
- DP: COGHILL, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 2DP 1DNP 3NR
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: LYNN
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: DAHLSTROM
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, RAMRAS, DAHLSTROM, HOLMES
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor