+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/31 CHAPTER 59 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/29/95
On May 13, 1995 in the House:
- 11:30 AM 5/13/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 13(STA)
On May 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/95
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (ADM)
- JUD RPT 3DP
On April 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (ADM)
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 13(STA)
- PASSED Y35 E5
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/9/95
- NR: MULDER, KOHRING, NAVARRE, BROWN
- DP: KELLY, THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- DP: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- FIN RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 7DP 4NR
On March 9, 1995 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 7DP
- DP: BUNDE, TOOHEY, GREEN
- DP: PORTER, VEZEY, FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- DP: ROBINSON, WILLIS, OGAN
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, GREEN, IVAN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 7DP
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 6, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor