+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/22/13
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 12:15 PM 5/10/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- FN2: (DNR)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 13 SLA 13
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 A1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N16
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 129(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 129(FIN)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN2: (DNR)
- NR: FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: MEYER, DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT 2DP 4NR
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: CSHB 129(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y27 N12 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 129(FIN)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 4NR 1AM
- NR: NEUMAN, GARA, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN2: (DNR)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: SEATON
- DP: HAWKER, JOHNSON, P.WILSON, FEIGE, SADDLER
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: (DNR)
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor