+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 69 SLA 12
- 3:35 PM 6/14/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TUCK
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 A2 V1
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 129(STA)
- MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 129(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, KOOKESH, FRENCH, OLSON, WAGONER,
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN2: (DHS)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT SCS (STA) 7DP
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26
- STA RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL
- FN2: (DHS)
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2011
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 129(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 129(FIN)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: (DHS)
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, GARA, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 11DP
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, COSTELLO
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: SADDLER
- DP: GATTO, MILLER, THOMPSON
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 3DP 1NR
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- MLV, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor