+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 27, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/25/95
On April 26, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/26 CHAPTER 11 SLA 95
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- 9:25 AM 4/11/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 8, 1995 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 128(RES)
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- ZERO FN TO SCS (ADM)
- (H) ZERO FNS (DEC, F&G)
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On March 9, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/09/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 128(RES) AM
- PASSED Y31 E3 A6
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, JAMES, BRICE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 5DP 3NR
- DP: GREEN, WILLIAMS, AUSTERMAN, KOTT
- DP: OGAN
- NR: NICHOLIA, MACLEAN, DAVIES
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DEC, F&G)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
- RES
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, TOOHEY
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor