+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 128(FIN) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 N2 E1
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS FAILED Y14 N25 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 128(FIN) AM
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y32 N4 E4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CALENDAR
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- AM: LEBON, CARPENTER, WOOL, THOMPSON
- NR: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON
- DP: ORTIZ, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR 4AM
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS