+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (56)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 9:15 AM 6/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 125 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/03
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y26 N8 E5 A1
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 127(STA) AM S
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 127(STA)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y10 N9 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y13 N5 E1 A1
- STEVENS B NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON, GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT SCS 2DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- DP: COWDERY, OLSON;
- NR: THERRIAULT, WAGONER; AM: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 127(STA)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, FOSTER, WOLF,
- GRUENBERG, STOLTZE, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 127(STA)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM, LYNN,
- DAHLSTROM, BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- COSPONSOR(S): FATE, MORGAN, OGG
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM, LYNN, CHENAULT,
- MEYER
On March 7, 2003 in the House:
- TRA RPT 3DP 2AM
- DP: FATE, HEINZE, HOLM; AM: KOHRING,
- MASEK
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor