+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 56 SLA 01
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- REPORT ADOPTED Y20 N- 2D CCS HB 127
- WITHDRAW MOTION TO ADOPT CCS HB 127 UC
- RESCIND ACTION ADPTING CC REPORT Y19 N1
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- REPORT ADOPTED Y38 N1 A1 2D CCS HB 127
- 2D CCS REPORT UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CC REPORT FAILED N39 A1
- RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING CC REPORT UC
On May 5, 2001 in the House:
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y39 A1 CCS HB 127
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- REPORT HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y20 N- CCS HB 127
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- *HALFORD, TAYLOR, OLSON
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N20
On May 2, 2001 in the House:
- *HARRIS, BUNDE, KERTTULA
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N39 E1
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- RETURNED TO UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- BROUGHT UP FOR CONSIDERATION
On April 29, 2001 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 127(TRA) AM S
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 127(TRA) AM S
On April 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: COWDERY; NR: TAYLOR, WILKEN, WARD
- TRA RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On March 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 127(RLS)
- PASSED Y33 E4 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, BUNDE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 127(RLS)
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: PORTER, KOHRING, KOTT; NR: JOULE;
- AM: BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- KOOKESH, MASEK
- DP: KAPSNER, OGAN, SCALZI, WILSON,
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6DP
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS