+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/3/20
- SIGNED INTO LAW 10/5 CHAPTER 29 SLA 19
- 9:12 A.M. 9/18/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 126
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 126
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, BIRCH, COSTELLO
- CRA RPT 5DP
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 126
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y36 N1 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 126
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: VANCE, ORTIZ, EDGMON, TALERICO, KOPP, LINCOLN, ZULKOSKY
- TRB RPT 7DP
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- TRB
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE TRIBAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor