+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 1DP 1DNP 5NR
- DP: BRICE; DNP: VEZEY; NR: DYSON, GREEN
- BUNDE, PORTER, KEMPLEN
- FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH HES REPORT
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FINANCE