+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/7/22
- 1:50 P.M. 7/29/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/9 CHAPTER 54 SLA 22
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y16 N- E2 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 125(L&C)
- VERSION: CSHB 125(L&C)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CAL
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2022
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, BISHOP, HUGHES, STEVENS, WIELECHOWSKI
- GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 3DP
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y35 N2 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 125(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 125(L&C)
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, ORTIZ, SNYDER
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: KAUFMAN
- DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 6DP 1NR
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- MLV RPT 6DP
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: CLAMAN, TARR, SHAW, NELSON, RAUSCHER, TUCK
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, STUTES
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, MCKAY
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- MLV, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor