+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:00 A.M. 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 24 SLA 20
On March 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SSHB 124
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 124
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2020
On March 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: COGHILL, KIEHL
- NR: MICCICHE
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N32 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N35 E3 A1
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y1 N35 E3 A1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y3 N33 E3 A1
- PASSED Y34 N3 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 124
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, STORY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: SSHB 124
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- HELD TO 3/17 CALENDAR
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/13 - ON 3/16 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DNP: EASTMAN
- DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, KOPP, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS