+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (68)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/7/93
- 3:29 PM 6/14/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 80 SLA 93
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- RETURNED TO SENATE
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- PLACED ON SECRETARY'S DESK W/PNDG AM
- RESCIND PREVIOUS ACTION UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- SENATE REQUEST RETURN OF BILL
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N- SCS CSHB 124(FIN) AM S
On May 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
- IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 10, 1993 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/10 CALENDAR
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO UNFIN BUSINESS
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE FAILED Y9 N11
- PASSED Y11 N9
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 124(FIN)
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 1DNP 4NR SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS H FNS (DCRA, ADM, H.FIN/MUN)
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 5/7/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N11
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y11 N9
- THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N10
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 27, 1993 in the House:
- PASSED Y27 N12 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 124(FIN)
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 2 FLD Y17 N23
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- MACKIE REMOVED RECONSIDERATION NOTICE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 26, 1993 in the House:
- -2 FNS(H.FIN/ADM,H.FIN/DCRA) 4/26/93
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 6NR 1AM
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: NAVARRE, THERRIAULT
- AM: BROWN
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY BROWN
- -ZERO FN (H.FIN/MUNICIPALITIES)4/26/93
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- OBJECTION TO ADVANCEMENT MOTION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
On April 21, 1993 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- CRA REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 3, 1993 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- -3 ZERO FNS (DCED, DEC, LABOR) 2/3/93
- -3 FNS (CRA, CRA, ADM) 2/3/93
- CRA, STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor