+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/29/22
- 11:00 A.M. 7/12/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 42 SLA 22
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRONK
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On May 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HB 123(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2022
- STA RPT SCS(STA) 2DP 2AM SAME TITLE
- DP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI
- AM: HOLLAND, COSTELLO
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UC
- ENGROSSED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 123(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, HOLLAND, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y15 N- E2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): REVAK
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- CRA REFERRAL REMOVED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- STEVENS, BISHOP, STEDMAN, VON IMHOF
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, KIEHL, KAWASAKI
- STA, CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- TAKEN FROM TABLE UC
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOTION TO TABLE UC
- VERSION: HB 123
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y35 N4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, HOPKINS, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 123
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, VANCE
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- DP: VANCE, CLAMAN, STORY, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
- NR: KAUFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: CRONK
- DP: FIELDS, TARR, ZULKOSKY
- TRB RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- TRB, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor