+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/3/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 36 SLA 05
On May 24, 2005 in the House:
- 8:05 PM 5/24/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 123(RLS) AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 123(RLS) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2005
On May 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: OLSON
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: SEEKINS, DAVIS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT 3DP
On April 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 25, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 123(RLS) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 123(RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED Y21 N13 E2 A4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y34 N4 E2
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y25 N13 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y23 N15 E2
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- NR: MCGUIRE;
- DP: COGHILL, ROKEBERG;
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 2DP 1NR 3AM
- AM: KOHRING, BERKOWITZ, KERTTULA
- FN1: (CED)
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: KELLY
- NR: HOLM, STOLTZE, MOSES, WEYHRAUCH, MEYER;
- DP: HAWKER, FOSTER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 5NR 1AM
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor