+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 16, 2023 in the House:
- 10:45 A.M. 8/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/28 CHAPTER 25 SLA 23
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/29/23
On May 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 123
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 123
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/23
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CAL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNBAR, MERRICK, TOBIN
On May 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON
- NR: BJORKMAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, GIESSEL, CLAMAN, BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, OLSON,
- STEVENS
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
On April 14, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 123
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, CRONK, STAPP, STORY, MCKAY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 123
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2023
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN, RUFFRIDGE, MINA
On April 10, 2023 in the House:
- CRA RPT 6DP
- DP: MEARS, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, RUFFRIDGE, MCCABE, MCCORMICK
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, FOSTER
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Sponsors (12)
C.JOHNSON
Type:
Primary Sponsor