+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP, REVAK, KIEHL, KAWASAKI
- RES RPT 5DP
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 122
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N23 E1 A2
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y23 N14 E1 A2
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
- PASSED Y29 N4 E1 A6
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 122 AM
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- HELD TO 5/9 CALENDAR
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2019
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: RASMUSSEN, HOPKINS, TALERICO
- DP: HANNAN, TARR, LINCOLN
- RES RPT 3DP 3NR
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor