+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/27/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/26 CHAPTER 29 SLA 05
On May 16, 2005 in the House:
- 1:00 PM 5/16/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 121(2D RLS)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- GUESS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(2D RLS)
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: ELLIS, STEDMAN
- DP: STEVENS G, WAGONER, KOOKESH
- CRA RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- 2D RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(2D RLS)
- PASSED Y35 N2 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 121(2D RLS)
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: KOHRING, BERKOWITZ, MCGUIRE, KERTTULA, ROKEBERG
- DP: COGHILL;
- RLS RPT CS(2D RLS) NT 1DP 5NR
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 4NR 2AM
- NR: HARRIS, KOHRING, COGHILL, ROKEBERG;
- AM: KERTTULA, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: GATTO
- DP: LYNN, RAMRAS, GRUENBERG, SEATON;
- STA RPT CS(CRA) NT 4DP 1NR
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: CISSNA, NEUMAN, SALMON, LEDOUX, OLSON
- DP: THOMAS;
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 1DP 5NR
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor