+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/1/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 73 SLA 01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 121(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 121(JUD)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- ADVANCED TO 3RD READING FLD Y12 N5 A3
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 5/6/01
On May 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- ELLIS
- DP: TAYLOR, THERRIAULT; NR: COWDERY,
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 5DP
- LEMAN, TORGERSON
- DP: PHILLIPS, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS,
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 18, 2001 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/01
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(L&C)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 121(L&C)
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: MEYER, COGHILL, JAMES, ROKEBERG
- JUD RPT CS(L&C) 4DP
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- MURKOWSKI; NR: HALCRO, CRAWFORD
- DP: KOTT, HAYES, MEYER, ROKEBERG,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 2NR
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS