+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/20/00
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 69 SLA 00
On May 5, 2000 in the House:
- 1:55 PM 5/5/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 21, 2000 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 A7
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/00
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(L&C) AM S
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/00
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DCED, ADM)
- DNP: TIM KELLY
- DP: MACKIE, LEMAN, HOFFMAN;
- L&C RPT 3DP 1DNP
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(L&C) AM
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- L&C
On April 15, 2000 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (ADM, DCED) 4/14/00
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, PHILLIPS
- NR: THERRIAULT, AUSTERMAN, DAVIES,
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, WILLIAMS, FOSTER;
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 6NR
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (ADM, DCED)
- SANDERS, HALCRO
- DP: ROKEBERG; NR: HARRIS, BRICE,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 4NR
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor