+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/5/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/4 CHAPTER 112 SLA 14
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:38 PM 7/25/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 121(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(FIN)
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 121(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, GARA, STOLTZE
- DP: T.WILSON, HOLMES, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 7NR
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: JOSEPHSON
- NR: HERRON, MILLETT, REINBOLD
- DP: CHENAULT, SADDLER
- L&C RPT 2DP 3NR 1AM
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor