+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/15 CHAPTER 4 SLA 07
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/16/07
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- 3:06 PM 3/5/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y30 N5 E4 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2007
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 120(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 120(FIN)
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/DPS)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/DPS)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, DYSON, HUGGINS, OLSON
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 120(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN, SALMON, RAMRAS
- VERSION: CSHB 120(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E2
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- NR: STOLTZE, KELLY
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
- DP: GARA, HAWKER, JOULE, CRAWFORD, THOMAS, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/DPS)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- FN2: (DPS)
- FN1: (DPS)
- DP: CISSNA, NEUMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, SEATON, ROSES, WILSON
- HES RPT 7DP
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor