+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/25/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 51 SLA 05
- 3:27 PM 6/22/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N5 A3
On May 9, 2005 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 119(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 119(FIN)
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN5: (CED)
- FN4: (CED) CORRECTED
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- NR: WILKEN, OLSON
- DP: GREEN, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y34 E3 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 119(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2005
- VERSION: CSHB 119(FIN)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- DP: WEYHRAUCH, JOULE, MOSES, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 5NR
- FN3: (H.FIN/CED)
- NR: HAWKER, HOLM, CROFT, STOLTZE, KELLY
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: SALMON
- DP: NEUMAN, KOTT, LEDOUX, OLSON, THOMAS;
- CRA RPT 5DP 1NR
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor