+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (60)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 1:12 PM 6/13/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 112 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/17/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 118(L&C)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 118(L&C)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS G, DYSON,
- TAYLOR, WAGONER, ELTON
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS(L&C) 5DP
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B,
- WAGONER, LINCOLN
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(DFG)
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- NR: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH, STEVENS G;
- DP: SEEKINS
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(DFG)
On March 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, RES
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 118(RES) AM
- PASSED Y37 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 118(RES) AM
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1AM
- DP: LYNN, HEINZE, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA,
- WOLF, MASEK; AM: GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP 2NR
- DP: HEINZE, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, SEATON;
- NR: BERKOWITZ, SAMUELS
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
SEATON BY REQUEST OF SALMON INDUSTRY TASK FORCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor