+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 118(STA)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NOS 2 & 3 UC
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N19 E6
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y33 N1 E6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 118(STA)(EFD AM)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 2/2 - ON 2/4 CALENDAR
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/31/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: ZERO(COR)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/2 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, FIELDS, TARR, STORY, SCHRAGE
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1NR
- DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
- NR: EASTMAN
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor