+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/26/07
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 5/28 CHAPTER 16 SLA 07
On May 4, 2007 in the House:
- 11:17 AM 5/4/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2007
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 117(JUD)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 117(JUD)
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: FRENCH, STEVENS, GREEN
- DP: MCGUIRE, BUNDE
- STA RPT 2DP 3NR
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 117(JUD)
- PASSED Y31 E9
- VERSION: CSHB 117(JUD)
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: JOHNSON, DOLL, COGHILL, GRUENBERG, ROSES, LYNN
- STA RPT 6DP
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS