+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/3/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 19 SLA 94
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- CLERICAL CORRECTION
- 1:25 PM 4/19/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 117
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/94
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- UPDATED ZERO FN (S.STA/DOT)
- STA RPT 3NR
On April 12, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DOT)
- TRA RPT 3DP
On March 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION, STATE AFFAIRS
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 N- E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 117
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/93
On March 15, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 5NR
- DP: LARSON,HANLEY,MARTIN,PARNELL,NAVARRE
- NR: MACLEAN, GRUSSENDORF, HOFFMAN
- NR: BROWN, THERRIAULT
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DOT) 3/1/93
On March 1, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOT) 3/1/93
- DP:MACKIE,MENARD,MULDER,FOSTER,G.DAVIS
- TRA RPT 5DP
On February 3, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSPORTATION, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)